Senate | 05/08/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1360.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | Read first time. To print. |