Senate | 06/24/2019 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 679.) | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 12). | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | Read first time. To print. |