Senate | 08/30/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2023.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2019 | Read first time. To print. |