|
09/27/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 349, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2443.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1932.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|