California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB46 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill June 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2019

Amended

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019