Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|