|
10/04/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 512, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2588.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 1805.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|