Senate | 07/09/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on EQ. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3890.) | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Read first time. To print. |