California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB465 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill August 19, 2020
Bill June 30, 2020
Bill August 28, 2019
Bill May 29, 2019