|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 7. Page 3407.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2755.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 1806.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 3.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|