California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2019

Amended

Bill June 3, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019