10/08/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 574, Statutes of 2019. | |||
10/08/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/23/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 2853.). | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 4). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 1249.) | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 19). | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2019 | Read first time. To print. |