California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill August 14, 2019
Bill June 4, 2019