California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB49 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill September 4, 2019
Bill July 5, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019
Bill January 22, 2019