Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2020
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2020
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on HEALTH.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2020
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3787.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|