California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2019

Amended

Bill June 19, 2019
Bill June 4, 2019
Bill May 28, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019