07/09/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 61, Statutes of 2019. | |||
07/09/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/02/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1817.). | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1077.) | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2019 | Read first time. To print. |