California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill May 30, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019