California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 18, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019