Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|