California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 20, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill July 3, 2019
Bill June 19, 2019