Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leyva.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 7. Page 1868.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|