|
07/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 69, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/05/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
(Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2486.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Bill in its final form passes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Vote on concurrence in final form pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1821.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1356.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|