|
10/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3506.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2815.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1259.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|