California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB543 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill June 18, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019