Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3891.) | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23). | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2019 | Read first time. To print. |