|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 746, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 3153.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 2574.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1810.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|