Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 3. Page 3892.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|