Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2020 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2019 | Read first time. To print. |