|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 3393.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2772.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 1513.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|