California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2019

Amended

Bill September 4, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019