Senate | 08/30/2019 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1870.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2019 | Read first time. To print. |