Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1190.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|