Senate | 06/26/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1624.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2019 | Read first time. To print. |