California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill July 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 12, 2019

Amended

Bill March 20, 2019
Bill March 7, 2019