|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 3314.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2512.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 1348.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|