07/12/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2019. | |||
07/12/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/08/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1881.). | ||
Senate | 06/26/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2019 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1254.) | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | Read first time. To print. |