California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB634 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Bill No. 634 CHAPTER 95 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. [ Approved by Governor July 12, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State July 12, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
1+Enrolled July 03, 2019 Passed IN Senate July 01, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 634Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 15, 2019 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
22
3- Assembly Bill No. 634 CHAPTER 95 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. [ Approved by Governor July 12, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State July 12, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled July 03, 2019 Passed IN Senate July 01, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 634Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 15, 2019 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
44
5- Assembly Bill No. 634 CHAPTER 95
5+ Enrolled July 03, 2019 Passed IN Senate July 01, 2019 Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019
66
7- Assembly Bill No. 634
7+Enrolled July 03, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate July 01, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly May 09, 2019
810
9- CHAPTER 95
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Assembly Bill
14+
15+No. 634
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Member SalasFebruary 15, 2019
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Member Salas
20+February 15, 2019
1021
1122 An act to add Section 101.15 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor July 12, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State July 12, 2019. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 AB 634, Salas. Traffic control devices: roundabouts: memorial and dedication signs.
2029
2130 Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.
2231
2332 Existing law provides that the Department of Transportation has full possession and control of all state highways and associated property.
2433
2534 The California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices provides for 5 types of highway facilities that may be used for memorial or dedication signing, including, among other things, freeways and highways.
2635
2736 This bill would require that roundabouts be added as a type of highway facility that may be used for memorial or dedication signing.
2837
2938 ## Digest Key
3039
3140 ## Bill Text
3241
3342 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
3443
3544 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3645
3746 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3847
3948 SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
4049
4150 SECTION 1. Section 101.15 is added to the Streets and Highways Code, to read:
4251
4352 ### SECTION 1.
4453
4554 101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
4655
4756 101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
4857
4958 101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.
5059
5160
5261
5362 101.15. Roundabouts shall be included in the list of highway facility types that may be used for memorial or dedication signing as designated in the California Manual on Uniform Traffic Control Devices, adopted pursuant to Section 21400 of the Vehicle Code.