|
09/24/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 116, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5468.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5466.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1811.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|