Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. | ||
Assembly | 12/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |