Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 1812.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|