California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB649 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill July 3, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019