LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB654
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB654
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB654
Action History
Assembly
02/03/2020
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2020
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
03/20/2019
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
02/28/2019
Referred to Com. on JUD.
Assembly
02/19/2019
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
Assembly
02/15/2019
Read first time. To print.