California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Amended

Bill August 11, 2020
Bill July 14, 2020
Bill May 29, 2020
Bill August 12, 2019
Bill July 11, 2019
Bill June 24, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019