07/12/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2019. | |||
07/12/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/08/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1870.). | ||
Senate | 06/25/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 1078.) | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 3). | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2019 | Read first time. To print. |