California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB673 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2019

Amended

Bill July 11, 2019
Bill June 20, 2019
Bill May 24, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019