California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019