Senate | 06/04/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2019 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1583.). | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2019 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and U. & E. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. | ||
Assembly | 12/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |