California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB714 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2019

Amended

Bill June 17, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019