|
07/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1876.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1465.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|